07/28/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2009-10 Fourth Extraordinary Session. | |||
07/28/2009 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/24/2009 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |||
07/23/2009 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 3. Page 73.) | |||
07/23/2009 | Read third time and amended. Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 43.) Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 43.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 59.) | |||
07/15/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/09/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
07/09/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 2. Page 30.) | |||
07/06/2009 | From printer. Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/02/2009 | Read first time. To print. |