|
07/28/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2009-10 Fourth Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
07/28/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 41. Noes 31. Page 88.)
|
|
|
|
07/24/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 70.) Amended pursuant to Joint Rule 23.5. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 71.)
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 43.) Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 43.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 2. Page 32.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From printer. Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|