LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ABX711
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ABX711
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ABX711
Action History
11/04/2009
From committee without further action.
11/02/2009
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
11/01/2009
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended.
10/30/2009
From printer. Read first time. Referred to Com. on RLS.
10/29/2009
Introduced. To print.