|
03/01/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2009-10 Eighth Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 55. Noes 15. Page 122.)
|
|
|
|
02/24/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 19. Noes 3.) (February 24).
|
|
|
|
02/23/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 86.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 87.)
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Corrected March 4.)
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. To second reading. Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 0. Page 51.)
|
|
|
|
02/01/2010
|
Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|