03/11/2010 | From committee without further action. | |||
02/22/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. by unanimous consent. | |||
02/18/2010 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
02/18/2010 | Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 70.) Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 75.) | |||
02/17/2010 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. | |||
02/11/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. To second reading. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
02/04/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
02/04/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 0. Page 52.) | |||
02/01/2010 | Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. To third reading. | |||
01/19/2010 | From printer. | |||
01/15/2010 | Read first time. To print. |