LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA11
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA11
Action History
03/18/2010
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. In committee: Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set.
03/17/2010
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
01/12/2010
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/20/2009
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
02/27/2009
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
02/26/2009
Read first time. To print.