LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA14
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA14
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA14
Action History
06/24/2009
In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
04/20/2009
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
03/02/2009
Read first time.
03/01/2009
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
02/27/2009
Introduced. To print.