LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA15
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA15
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA15
Action History
06/01/2009
To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Arambula.
05/29/2009
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
05/20/2009
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
05/07/2009
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 6).
04/20/2009
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and APPR.
03/11/2009
From printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
03/10/2009
Read first time. To print.