05/13/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/12/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. (Corrected May 17.) | |||
01/11/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
08/24/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
07/07/2009 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/20/2009 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
03/27/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 26. | |||
03/26/2009 | Read first time. To print. |