08/26/2010 | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading by unanimous consent. | |||
09/03/2009 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Block. | |||
08/31/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 27). Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/01/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/24/2009 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23). | |||
04/20/2009 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
12/02/2008 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | |||
12/01/2008 | Read first time. To print. |