08/31/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. To third reading. | |||
07/01/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/24/2009 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). | |||
06/17/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
06/16/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/20/2009 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
12/02/2008 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | |||
12/01/2008 | Read first time. To print. |