08/31/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 27). Read second time. To third reading. | |||
08/20/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
07/15/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
07/14/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
07/13/2009 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7). | |||
06/24/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/17/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
06/16/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/20/2009 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |||
12/16/2008 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 15. Read first time. | |||
12/15/2008 | Introduced. To print. |