From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27). Read second time. To third reading.
07/01/2009
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
06/16/2009
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 15).
04/21/2009
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
04/20/2009
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
12/17/2008
From printer. May be heard in committee January 16.