|
01/14/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV., REV. & TAX. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|