02/26/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2010. | |||
02/26/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m. | |||
02/22/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
02/22/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2866.) | |||
02/18/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
02/08/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/08/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3990.) | |||
02/04/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 4). | |||
02/02/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
02/01/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |||
01/07/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
01/05/2010 | From printer. | |||
01/04/2010 | Introduced. To print. |