BILL NUMBER: ACR 103CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 117 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 18, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 23, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 17, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 13, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member John A. Perez JANUARY 7, 2010 Relative to the Los Angeles County Deputy Sheriff Juan Abel Escalante Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 103, John A. Perez. Los Angeles County Deputy Sheriff Juan Abel Escalante Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 101 in Los Angeles County as the Los Angeles County Deputy Sheriff Juan Abel Escalante Memorial Highway. This measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering those costs, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Of all the promises the United States offers, none is more precious or elusive than the right to be free from crime and violence; and WHEREAS, The men and women of law enforcement have the unenviable task of guaranteeing the public's safety, which is as difficult and dangerous as it is important; and WHEREAS, Californians are indebted every day to our peace officers; and WHEREAS, We pay special tribute to peace officers' bravery and dedication, and share in their pain, when one of their members is killed in the line of duty; and WHEREAS, Juan Abel Escalante faithfully served the Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department and the residents of Los Angeles County as a deputy assigned to the Custody Division; and WHEREAS, Deputy Escalante was a United States Army Reservist awarded the Armed Forces Reserve Medal, Army Service Ribbon, National Defense Service Medal, Global War on Terrorism Service Medal, and the Army Achievement Medal; and WHEREAS, Deputy Escalante is remembered as a passionate, loving husband to his wife, Celeste, a loving son to his parents, Anna and Cesar Powell, a caring father to his children Alexander, Julian, and Marisa, and a thoughtful sibling to his brothers, Edgar and Cesar; and WHEREAS, Deputy Escalante committed his life to his family and friends, and his career to Los Angeles County and the safety of its residents; and WHEREAS, Deputy Escalante was loved by his friends and coworkers, and had earned a reputation of caring deeply for his partners and for being firm yet fair with inmates; and WHEREAS, Deputy Escalante was killed in the line of duty outside his home in the City of Los Angeles on August 2, 2008; and WHEREAS, In recognition of the hazardous work and serious responsibility Deputy Escalante willingly accepted, and the strong commitment he demonstrated, during his 2 1/2 years as a law enforcement officer, and his contributions and sacrifice in serving and protecting the residents of Los Angeles County, it would be a fitting tribute to designate a portion of State Highway Route 101, in Los Angeles County, as the Los Angeles County Deputy Sheriff Juan Abel Escalante Memorial Highway; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 101 from North Mission Road to North Alameda Street, including the on ramp and off ramp of North Vignes Street, in Los Angeles County as the Los Angeles County Sheriff Deputy Juan Abel Escalante Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.