04/27/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2010. | |||
04/27/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |||
04/22/2010 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4788.) | |||
04/15/2010 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
04/15/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3198.) | |||
04/12/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/05/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/05/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4452.) | |||
03/24/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (March 23). | |||
03/10/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/09/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Amended. | |||
01/27/2010 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
01/21/2010 | From printer. | |||
01/20/2010 | Introduced. To print. |