04/01/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2009. | |||
04/01/2009 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. | |||
03/26/2009 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
03/26/2009 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 352.) | |||
03/09/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
01/27/2009 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/26/2009 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 234.) | |||
01/20/2009 | From printer. | |||
01/16/2009 | Introduced. To print. |