08/30/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 108, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/30/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/18/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/18/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 4. Page 4600.) | |||
08/02/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
05/24/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/24/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5289.) | |||
05/20/2010 | Read and amended. (Page 5239.) | |||
04/28/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 27). | |||
02/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
01/28/2010 | From printer. | |||
01/27/2010 | Introduced. To print. |