08/09/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 73, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/09/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
08/02/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/02/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4311.) | |||
04/22/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/22/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4822.) | |||
04/15/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (April 15). | |||
02/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
01/28/2010 | From printer. | |||
01/27/2010 | Introduced. To print. |