04/30/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2010. | |||
04/30/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:50 p.m. | |||
04/26/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
04/26/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3327.) | |||
04/21/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/12/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/08/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4548.) | |||
03/18/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 18). | |||
02/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
02/05/2010 | From printer. | |||
02/04/2010 | Introduced. To print. |