08/17/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 87, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/17/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
08/11/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/11/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4454.) | |||
08/04/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
03/01/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/25/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4171.) | |||
02/22/2010 | Amended. To third reading. | |||
02/18/2010 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 18). | |||
02/17/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
02/16/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |||
02/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
02/05/2010 | From printer. | |||
02/04/2010 | Introduced. To print. |