BILL NUMBER: ACR 12CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 84 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 24, 2009 ADOPTED IN SENATE JULY 9, 2009 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 17, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 10, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 25, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Blakeslee (Coauthor: Assembly Member Caballero) JANUARY 20, 2009 Relative to the National Purple Heart Trail. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 12, Blakeslee. National Purple Heart Trail. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 101 from Monterey County to Santa Barbara County for inclusion in the National Purple Heart Trail. The measure would also request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost for appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs. WHEREAS, The National Purple Heart Trail was established in 1992 for the purpose of commemorating and honoring men and women who have been wounded or killed in combat while serving in the United States Armed Forces; and WHEREAS, The National Purple Heart Trail courses its way across the vast majority of the United States; and WHEREAS, In 2001, pursuant to Senate Concurrent Resolution 14, the Legislature designated portions of State Highway Routes 5 and 80 as California's selections for inclusion in the National Purple Heart Trail; and WHEREAS, The Legislature finds that it is appropriate to designate additional portions of the state highway system for inclusion in the National Purple Heart Trail in order to honor the men and women who have been wounded or killed in combat while serving in the United States Armed Forces; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 101 from mile marker 9.67 in Monterey County to mile marker 36.16 in Santa Barbara County for inclusion in the National Purple Heart Trail; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing that special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.