08/17/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/17/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
08/12/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/12/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4489.) | |||
08/02/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
03/08/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/04/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4215.) | |||
02/25/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 25). | |||
02/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
02/10/2010 | From printer. | |||
02/09/2010 | Introduced. To print. |