07/07/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/07/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |||
07/01/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
07/01/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4200.) | |||
04/12/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/08/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4547.) | |||
03/25/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 25). | |||
03/22/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
03/18/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
02/16/2010 | From printer. | |||
02/12/2010 | Introduced. To print. |