09/07/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/07/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | |||
08/23/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/23/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4766.) | |||
08/04/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |||
05/10/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/10/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5088.) | |||
05/05/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (May 4). | |||
04/05/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Amended. (Corrected April 5.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/23/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/17/2010 | From printer. | |||
02/16/2010 | Introduced. To print. |