|
09/09/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6561.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4715.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4860.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|