07/06/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/06/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | |||
06/28/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/28/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4099.) | |||
06/23/2010 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/26/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/08/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/08/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4551.) | |||
03/25/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (March 24). | |||
03/15/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/11/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Amended. | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/18/2010 | From printer. | |||
02/17/2010 | Introduced. To print. |