09/14/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/14/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/30/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/27/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4978.) | |||
08/20/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/10/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/09/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 11. Page 6108.) | |||
08/05/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 4). | |||
06/30/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/29/2010 | Amended. | |||
06/28/2010 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |||
06/15/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/03/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
06/02/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. (Corrected June 3.) | |||
05/28/2010 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/19/2010 | From printer. | |||
02/18/2010 | Introduced. To print. |