|
08/23/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 103, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Page 6168.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4413.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4936.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|