06/28/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2010. | |||
06/28/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:40 p.m. | |||
06/24/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/24/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. To Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4058.) | |||
04/27/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/26/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4858.) (Corrected April 27.) | |||
04/22/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 22). | |||
03/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |