07/06/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/06/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | |||
06/28/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/28/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4092.) | |||
06/22/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |||
05/27/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
05/13/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/13/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5162.) | |||
05/10/2010 | Amended. To Consent Calendar. | |||
05/06/2010 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 4). | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. | |||
02/26/2010 | From printer. | |||
02/25/2010 | Introduced. To print. |