09/16/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/16/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | |||
08/31/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/31/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 2. Page 5072.) | |||
08/30/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/05/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/25/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4417.) | |||
03/18/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 18). | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
03/09/2010 | From printer. | |||
03/08/2010 | Introduced. To print. |