05/05/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2010. | |||
05/05/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:55 a.m. | |||
04/29/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
04/29/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3381.) | |||
04/21/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/19/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4713.) | |||
04/15/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). | |||
04/12/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
04/08/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
03/11/2010 | From printer. | |||
03/10/2010 | Introduced. To print. |