LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR147
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR147
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR147
Action History
06/23/2010
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
04/26/2010
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
04/22/2010
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4795.)
04/15/2010
From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15).
03/25/2010
Referred to Com. on RULES.
03/23/2010
From printer.
03/22/2010
Introduced. To print.