|
07/17/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
07/17/2009
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1521.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1238.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Amended.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2009
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|