|
08/23/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6081.) (Corrected August 16.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 4306.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5050.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|