08/09/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/09/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
08/02/2010 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6000.) | |||
07/01/2010 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
07/01/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4200.) | |||
06/29/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/17/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/13/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5150.) | |||
05/11/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |||
04/22/2010 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
04/20/2010 | From printer. | |||
04/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |