09/07/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/07/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | |||
08/23/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/23/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4763.) | |||
08/20/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/28/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/28/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5847.) | |||
06/24/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 23). | |||
06/17/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
06/16/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Amended. (Corrected June 17.) | |||
05/03/2010 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
04/28/2010 | Introduced. To print. |