|
09/14/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6864.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4943.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6005.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|