08/09/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/09/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
08/02/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/02/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4311.) | |||
06/22/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/21/2010 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5737.) | |||
06/17/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). | |||
06/03/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
05/25/2010 | From printer. | |||
05/24/2010 | Introduced. To print. |