09/14/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/14/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/30/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/25/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4874.) | |||
08/20/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/10/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/09/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6099.) | |||
08/05/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 5). | |||
08/03/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
08/02/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RULES. Amended. | |||
06/03/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
05/25/2010 | From printer. | |||
05/24/2010 | Introduced. To print. |