09/14/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/14/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/30/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/26/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4943.) | |||
08/12/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/12/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6176.) | |||
08/05/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (August 4). | |||
06/30/2010 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |||
06/24/2010 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). | |||
06/03/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
05/25/2010 | From printer. | |||
05/24/2010 | Introduced. To print. |