08/10/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/09/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6097.) | |||
08/02/2010 | Amended. To third reading. | |||
07/06/2010 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). | |||
06/15/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |||
06/14/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Amended. | |||
06/03/2010 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | |||
06/01/2010 | From printer. | |||
05/28/2010 | Introduced. To print. |