06/28/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 40, Statutes of 2010. | |||
06/28/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:40 p.m. | |||
06/24/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
06/24/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. To Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4058.) | |||
06/21/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/17/2010 | From Consent Calendar. To third reading. Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 5702.) | |||
06/10/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (June 10). | |||
06/03/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
06/01/2010 | From printer. | |||
05/28/2010 | Introduced. To print. |