LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR172
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR172
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR172
Action History
08/02/2010
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
08/02/2010
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6006.)
06/30/2010
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (June 30).
06/15/2010
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14).
06/03/2010
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
06/02/2010
From printer.
06/01/2010
Introduced. To print.