|
09/09/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6708.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Passed on file.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4715.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6006.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2010
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|