BILL NUMBER: ACR 174ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 20, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 26, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 16, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 14, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Eng (Coauthor: Senator Calderon) JUNE 7, 2010 Relative to the Roberto "Bobby" Salcedo Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 174, Eng. Roberto "Bobby" Salcedo Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a portion of State Highway Route 60 in the County of Los Angeles as the Roberto "Bobby" Salcedo Memorial Highway. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs. WHEREAS, Roberto "Bobby" Salcedo was a victim in a senseless killing spree on December 31, 2009, in Gomez Palacio, Durango, Mexico, where he and his wife Betzy were visiting her family for the Christmas holidays; and WHEREAS, Mr. Salcedo graduated in 1994 from Mountain View High School in El Monte, and continued his education at California State University, Long Beach, where he earned a bachelor of arts degree in history, with a specialization in the history of the United States and Latin America; and WHEREAS, While earning his degree, Mr. Salcedo worked as a program assistant in the California Student Opportunity and Access (Cal-SOAP) program at Mountain View High School, promoting the value of higher education and assisting students with college applications and financial aid documents; and WHEREAS, In 1998, Mr. Salcedo began his teaching career in the Social Sciences Department at South El Monte High School, where he was highly regarded as an excellent role model and an enthusiastic teacher; and WHEREAS, In 2004, Mr. Salcedo earned a master of arts degree in educational administration at California State University, San Bernardino, and was promoted to Assistant Principal of Activities at South El Monte High School; and WHEREAS, Mr. Salcedo was later appointed as Assistant Principal for Instruction at Mountain View High School; and WHEREAS, Most recently, Mr. Salcedo served the El Monte High School District as Assistant Principal for Instruction at El Monte High School, following his appointment in September, 2009, and also had been reelected to a third term on the Board of Trustees of the El Monte City School District; and WHEREAS, In addition to his commitment to education, Mr. Salcedo was also extremely active in his community; and WHEREAS, At the time of his death, Mr. Salcedo was working on his doctorate degree at the University of California, Los Angeles; and WHEREAS, It is appropriate to dedicate a portion of State Highway Route 60 in Mr. Salcedo's memory; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the portion of State Highway Route 60 between Atlantic Boulevard in the City of Monterey Park and the city limit of the City of Rosemead in the County of Los Angeles is hereby designated as the Roberto "Bobby" Salcedo Memorial Highway; and, be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is hereby requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved,That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.