09/14/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2010. | |||
09/14/2010 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/30/2010 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |||
08/30/2010 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 4. Page 5006.) | |||
08/25/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/10/2010 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/09/2010 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6098.) | |||
08/05/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 5). | |||
06/28/2010 | Referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
06/25/2010 | From printer. | |||
06/24/2010 | Introduced. To print. |