|
09/14/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 160, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2010
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6864.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4943.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6300.)
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Amended.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 9).
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2010
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|